2. | Charles (Gordon-Lennox), 5th Duke of Richmond was born on 3 Aug. 1791 in Richmond House, Whitehall Gardens, London, England (son of General Charles (Lennox), 4th Duke of Richmond and Lady Charlotte Gordon); died on 21 Oct. 1860 in Portland Place, Marylebone, Middlesex, England; was buried in Chichester Cathedral, Chichester, Sussex, England. Other Events:
- Office: High Steward of Chichester
- Education: to 1809, Westminster, Middlesex, England; Westminster School
- Education: From 28 Oct. 1809 to 1813, Dublin, Co. Dublin, Ireland; Trinity College, Dublin
- Office: From 1812 to 1819; Member of Parliament (M.P.) for Chichester
- Office: From 1819 to 1860; Colonel of the Sussex Militia
- Hereditary Title: From 28 Aug. 1819 to 21 Oct. 1860; 5th Baron of Settrington, co. York [E., 1675]
- Hereditary Title: From 28 Aug. 1819 to 21 Oct. 1860; 5th Duke of Lennox [S., 1675]
- Hereditary Title: From 28 Aug. 1819 to 21 Oct. 1860; 5th Duke of Richmond [E., 1675]
- Hereditary Title: From 28 Aug. 1819 to 21 Oct. 1860; 5th Earl of Darnley [S., 1675]
- Hereditary Title: From 28 Aug. 1819 to 21 Oct. 1860; 5th Earl of March [E., 1675]
- Hereditary Title: From 28 Aug. 1819 to 21 Oct. 1860; 5th Lord of Torboultoun [S., 1675]
- Decoration: 12 May 1829; Knight of the Order of the Garter (K.G.)
- Office: From Nov. 1830 to May 1834; Postmaster-General
- Office: 22 Nov. 1830; Privy Councillor (P.C.)
- Office: 1831; Vice-Admiral of Sussex
- Office: 1832; Militia A.D.C. to William IV
- Office: From 1835 to 1860; Lord Lieutenant of Sussex
- Office: From 1836 to 1860; Chancellor of Marischal College, Aberdeen
- Decoration: 2 April 1840; Fellow of the Royal Society (F.R.S.)
- Office: From 1841 to 1845; President of the Royal Highland and Agricultural Society of Scotland
- Office: 1845; President of the Royal Agricultural Society
- Office: From Sept. 1860 to 21 Oct. 1860; Joint Chancellor of Aberdeen University
Notes:
He took by Royal licence, 9 August 1836, the additional surname of Gordon on succeeding to the estates of his maternal uncle, the 5th and last Duke of Gordon [S.].
As a peer he was anti-Catholic and seceded from the Tory party when Peel gave way to the Catholic claims. Being a member of the Grey cabinet he supported the Reform Bill, but he was alone in dissenting from their decision, 8 May 1832, to resign if the King would not give them powers to make peers at once (Trevelyan, Lord Grey of the Reform Bill, page 339). He resigned in May 1834, joined Peel as one of the new Conservative party and became leader of the Protectionists. Lord Beauvale wrote to Lady Palmerston from Toplitz, 23 June 1841: "Sir John Courcy says the Queen will send en cas de besoin for the Duke of Richmond" (Lady Airlie, Lady Palmerston and her Times, volume ii, page 63). In January 1842 he declined Peel's offer to appoint him Lord Privy Seal (Parker, Sir Robert Peel, volume ii, page 519).
Education:
Bachelor of Arts (B.A.)
Office:
Tory
Hereditary Title:
"Torboltoun" (only) in the patent (Mag. Sig.) as quoted in Wood's Douglas, volume ii, page 688, but "Tarbolton" in Scots Peerage, volume v, page 363, and "Methven of Torboltoun" according to the later peerages. See also Cal. S. P. Dom., 1679–80, page 616.
Charles married Lady Caroline Paget on 10 April 1817 in St. James's, Westminster, Middlesex, England. Caroline (daughter of Henry William (Paget), 1st Marquess of Anglesey and Lady Caroline Elizabeth Villiers) was born on 6 June 1796; died on 12 March 1874 in Portland Place, Marylebone, Middlesex, England; was buried in Chichester Cathedral, Chichester, Sussex, England. [Group Sheet] [Family Chart]
|